Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 69 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7076 Week
» 13210 Month
» 241094 Year
» 1462659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Willesden


Depot Details
Depot Name Willesden
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
1A01/02/193505/05/1973
WN06/05/1973
Date Opened 1873
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the main line just north of the station. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside Willesden (L.M.S. or L.P.T.B.) Station along Old Oak Lane, and take the first turning on the right. This is a short cul-de-sac, and a path leads from the end to the shed.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1873Depot opened
06/1874Change of code to 2
01/01/1923Change of code to W2
01/01/1935Change of code to 1A
27/09/1965Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to WN