Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2635 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16041 Week
» 69057 Month
» 188584 Year
» 3215437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2113 |
m/e |
05/1877 |
British Railways |
32113 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
Black Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1877 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1958 |
Service Life |
81 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
30/04/1949 |
Brighton Works |
A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. |
SLS/194905 |
19/03/1952 |
Ashford Works |
32128 has been cut up at Ashford, while 32113, 148 an 157 await a similar fate. The last two are oil burners ex store and 170 an 172 were also noted en route for Ashford on 23/3/52. E6x 32407 has received new cylinders and heavy boiler repairs, E6 32414 has also received a general, while 2407 awaits her turn. The solitary lined out E3, 32166, is back' for shops and has been well looked after during the past two years as it is surprisingly clean. |
SLS/195206 |
03/03/1953 |
Brighton Works |
No. 80059, the first of ten new 2-6-4 tanks left the works on 3rd March; a further ten are also to be built in this 'year's programme. Engines under and awaiting repair include 30027, 30109, 30825/37, 30338, 30951/7, 32655. 30117 an 30919 have been through shops but have not been repainted. While DS515 was receiving attention here its place at Lancing was taken by 32636; 80060 was due on 2/3 but was not ready. An unusual visitor to the shed on 3rd March was 32113. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1877 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2113 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32113 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32113 |
|
|
10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|