SR Wainwright "C" Class 0-6-0
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
C | 1004 | 31004 | 07/1901 | RAM 70A 73H 73F W |
Ramsgate Nine Elms Dover Marine Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 26/05/1961 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 |
C | 1018 | 31018 | 10/1900 | HIT W |
Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 |
C | 1033 | 31033 | 10/1900 | BA 70A 70B W |
Bricklayers Arms Nine Elms Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 14/06/1959 18/07/1959 19/03/1960 |
19/03/1960 |
C | 1037 | 31037 | 03/1901 | STL 74D 74A 73A 73D 70A 70C 70C W |
St Leonards Tonbridge Ashford Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Guildford Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1952 08/02/1954 12/06/1957 08/10/1957 14/06/1959 18/07/1959 05/04/1960 25/02/1961 |
25/02/1961 |
C | 1038 | 31038 | 07/1901 | STL 74D W |
St Leonards Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1952 03/1954 |
03/1954 |
C | 1054 | 31054 | 03/1901 | HIT 74B 73C 70A 70C 70C W |
Hither Green Ramsgate Hither Green Nine Elms Guildford Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 27/03/1953 14/06/1959 18/07/1959 05/04/1960 20/08/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
C | 1059 | 31059 | 11/1902 | HIT W |
Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/02/1958 |
22/02/1958 |
C | 1061 | 31061 | 07/1901 | HIT 70A 73J 70B W |
Hither Green Nine Elms Tonbridge Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 08/07/1960 29/07/1961 |
29/07/1961 |
C | 1063 | 31063 | 07/1900 | TON 74C 73C W |
Tonbridge Dover Marine Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 27/06/1951 04/1956 |
04/1956 |
C | 1068 | 31068 | 01/1903 | HIT 73B W |
Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 10/1961 |
10/1961 |
C | 1071 | 31071 | 07/1901 | HIT 73B W |
Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 09/1959 |
09/1959 |
C | 1086 | 31086 | 09/1900 | TON GFD 73D 73B W |
Tonbridge Guildford Gillingham (Kent) Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 12/05/1951 22/10/1960 |
22/10/1960 |
C | 1090 | 31090 | 01/1903 | BA GFD 73D 73B W |
Bricklayers Arms Guildford Gillingham (Kent) Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 12/05/1951 08/08/1953 |
08/08/1953 |
C | 1102 | 31102 | 09/1900 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1960 |
05/1960 |
C | 1112 | 31112 | 09/1900 | GIL 73B 73D 73D 70A 73H 73F W |
Gillingham (Kent) Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Dover Marine Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 14/06/1959 19/08/1959 26/05/1961 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
C | 1113 | 31113 | 03/1902 | HIT 74C 70B W |
Hither Green Dover Marine Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 08/07/1960 15/07/1961 |
15/07/1961 |
C | 1150 | 31150 | 11/1902 | TON HIT 74C 70B W |
Tonbridge Hither Green Dover Marine Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 27/06/1951 08/07/1960 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
C | 1191 | 31191 | 07/1900 | HIT 74C W |
Hither Green Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 09/1959 |
09/1959 |
C | 1218 | 31218 | 12/1900 | AFD W |
Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
C | 1219 | 31219 | 12/1900 | TON 74A W |
Tonbridge Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1954 10/10/1959 |
10/10/1959 |
C | 1221 | 31221 | 03/1901 | TON GFD 73D 73A 74A W |
Tonbridge Guildford Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 08/02/1954 06/11/1954 15/08/1959 |
15/08/1959 |
C | 1223 | 31223 | 03/1901 | BA 73D 74A W |
Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 08/02/1954 14/05/1960 |
14/05/1960 |
C | 1225 | 31225 | 12/1900 | TON GFD 73C 73C 73B W |
Tonbridge Guildford Hither Green Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 08/02/1954 04/06/1955 |
04/06/1955 |
C | 1227 | 31227 | 12/1900 | TON GFD 73B 73D 70A W |
Tonbridge Guildford Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 12/05/1951 14/06/1959 24/10/1959 |
24/10/1959 |
C | 1229 | 31229 | 01/1900 | FAV 73D 70A 73A 73B W |
Faversham Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 08/07/1960 10/1961 |
10/1961 |
C | 1234 | 31234 | 04/1901 | GIL BAT 73D W |
Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 12/05/1951 08/08/1953 |
08/08/1953 |
C | 1242 | 31242 | 04/1902 | FAV 73D 73B 73D 73E 70A W |
Faversham Gillingham (Kent) Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 08/02/1954 19/03/1954 21/06/1955 14/06/1959 30/09/1961 |
30/09/1961 |
C | 1243 | 31243 | 04/1902 | HIT 74C W |
Hither Green Dover Marine Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 10/10/1959 |
10/10/1959 |
C | 1244 | 31244 | 04/1902 | HIT DOV TON 74B 74D W |
Hither Green Dover Marine Tonbridge Ramsgate Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 01/06/1948 14/02/1953 27/03/1953 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
C | 1245 | 31245 | 12/1902 | HIT 73G 70A W |
Hither Green Ramsgate Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1958 14/06/1959 08/08/1959 |
08/08/1959 |
C | 1252 | 31252 | 12/1902 | DOV RAM 70A W |
Dover Marine Ramsgate Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 14/06/1959 07/1959 |
07/1959 |
C | 1253 | 31253 | 01/1903 | HIT BA 73D 73E 70C 73A 73C W |
Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Guildford Stewarts Lane Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 11/12/1954 20/04/1955 08/10/1957 17/10/1959 |
17/10/1959 |
C | 1255 | 31255 | 06/1900 | DOV 73D 73E 73F W |
Dover Marine Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1950 27/06/1951 14/06/1959 30/09/1961 |
30/09/1961 |
C | 1256 | 31256 | 06/1900 | GIL 73E 73F W |
Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 14/06/1959 29/07/1961 |
29/07/1961 |
C | 1257 | 31257 | 06/1900 | HIT HIT W |
Hither Green Hither Green Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
C | 1260 | 31260 | 08/1904 | FAV AFD 74D 73E 73E W |
Faversham Ashford Tonbridge Faversham Faversham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 27/07/1951 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 05/1953 |
05/1953 |
C | 1267 | 31267 | 01/1904 | GIL 73E 73B W |
Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 08/02/1954 30/06/1962 |
30/06/1962 |
C | 1268 | 31268 | 02/1904 | AFD FAV 70A 73C 73F W |
Ashford Faversham Nine Elms Hither Green Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 26/05/1961 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
C | 1270 | 31270 | 06/1904 | HIT 74D W |
Hither Green Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 20/06/1959 |
20/06/1959 |
C | 1271 | 31271 | 12/1904 | AFD 74D 74B 70A 73B W |
Ashford Tonbridge Ramsgate Nine Elms Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 30/06/1952 14/06/1959 09/11/1961 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
C | 1272 | 31272 | 02/1904 | TON W |
Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1959 |
08/08/1959 |
C | 1277 | 31277 | 02/1904 | BA TON W |
Bricklayers Arms Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 09/1955 |
09/1955 |
C | 1280 | 31280 | 02/1908 | BA 74D 75C 75A 75A 73F W |
Bricklayers Arms Tonbridge Norwood Junction Brighton Brighton Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1957 05/10/1960 24/11/1960 23/08/1961 08/12/1961 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
C | 1287 | 31287 | 05/1908 | BA 73D 73B 73C W |
Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Bricklayers Arms Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 12/05/1951 01/04/1957 08/10/1960 |
08/10/1960 |
C | 1291 | 31291 | 02/1908 | DOV 73B W |
Dover Marine Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 05/1953 |
05/1953 |
C | 1293 | 31293 | 06/1908 | BAT GFD 73B W |
Stewarts Lane Guildford Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
C | 1294 | 31294 | 06/1908 | BA GFD 73B W |
Bricklayers Arms Guildford Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1948 22/04/1950 10/1955 |
10/1955 |
C | 1297 | 31297 | 06/1908 | BA 74B 73B 73D 70A W |
Bricklayers Arms Ramsgate Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 27/03/1953 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 12/09/1959 |
12/09/1959 |
C | 1298 | 31298 | 03/1908 | HIT RAM 73E 70A 73C W |
Hither Green Ramsgate Faversham Nine Elms Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 12/06/1957 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 11/1960 |
11/1960 |
C | 1317 | 31317 | 03/1908 | GIL 73E 74C 73A W |
Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 12/06/1957 24/02/1962 |
24/02/1962 |
C | 1460 | 31460 | 10/1902 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 |
C | 1461 | 31461 | 12/1902 | TON 73E 73A 73B W |
Tonbridge Faversham Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 01/10/1953 01/04/1957 31/08/1958 |
31/08/1958 |
C | 1480 | 31480 | 01/1904 | HIT 73B W |
Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1957 08/07/1961 |
08/07/1961 |
C | 1481 | 31481 | 04/1904 | FAV 73C 73E 70A 73H 70B 73C 73F W |
Faversham Hither Green Faversham Nine Elms Dover Marine Feltham Hither Green Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 14/06/1959 19/08/1959 08/07/1960 17/01/1961 26/05/1961 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 |
C | 1486 | 31486 | 12/1902 | HIT W |
Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1953 |
05/1953 |
C | 1495 | 31495 | 06/1904 | FAV 73D 70A W |
Faversham Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 14/06/1959 11/03/1961 |
11/03/1961 |
C | 1498 | 31498 | 06/1904 | BAT GIL 73C 74E 73C 70B W |
Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Hither Green St Leonards Hither Green Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 08/02/1954 25/01/1957 06/06/1958 08/07/1960 29/07/1961 |
29/07/1961 |
C | 1508 | 31508 | 07/1904 | BAT GFD 73B 73D 73E 73D W |
Stewarts Lane Guildford Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 22/04/1950 12/05/1951 08/02/1954 19/03/1954 28/09/1957 |
28/09/1957 |
C | 1510 | 31510 | 07/1904 | GIL 70A 73B W |
Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 09/11/1961 30/06/1962 |
30/06/1962 |
C | 1513 | 31513 | 06/1908 | TON GFD 74A W |
Tonbridge Guildford Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 22/04/1950 03/1955 |
03/1955 |
C | 1572 | 31572 | 09/1903 | HIT TON GFD 74A W |
Hither Green Tonbridge Guildford Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/03/1948 04/02/1950 22/04/1950 03/1954 |
03/1954 |
C | 1573 | 31573 | 09/1903 | GIL 73A 73C 70B W |
Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Hither Green Feltham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 08/10/1957 08/07/1960 18/11/1961 |
18/11/1961 |
C | 1575 | 31575 | 09/1903 | BAT 73B W |
Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/02/1961 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
C | 1576 | 31576 | 05/1903 | BAT 73D 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1957 14/06/1959 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
C | 1578 | 31578 | 10/1903 | BAT W |
Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1961 |
24/06/1961 |
C | 1579 | 31579 | 10/1903 | GIL 73A 73D 70A 73C 70B 73A W |
Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Hither Green Feltham Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 08/10/1957 14/06/1959 10/03/1960 08/07/1960 17/01/1961 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 |
C | 1580 | 31580 | 08/1903 | TON 73A W |
Tonbridge Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 08/08/1953 |
08/08/1953 |
C | 1581 | 31581 | 05/1903 | HIT 73A W |
Hither Green Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
C | 1582 | 31582 | 06/1903 | BAT 73C 73A W |
Stewarts Lane Hither Green Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/07/1951 07/06/1958 |
07/06/1958 |
C | 1583 | 31583 | 08/1903 | GIL 73A 74D 73A W |
Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Tonbridge Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 10/10/1955 01/04/1957 07/1961 |
07/1961 |
C | 1584 | 31584 | 06/1903 | BA 73D 73A W |
Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/07/1951 17/02/1962 |
17/02/1962 |
C | 1585 | 31585 | 06/1903 | GIL 74D 74D W |
Gillingham (Kent) Tonbridge Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 08/10/1951 14/02/1959 |
14/02/1959 |
C | 1588 | 31588 | 03/1908 | GIL 74D 73F W |
Gillingham (Kent) Tonbridge Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 09/11/1961 23/06/1962 |
23/06/1962 |
C | 1589 | 31589 | 03/1908 | AFD 74D 74A 74A W |
Ashford Tonbridge Ashford Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 06/12/1951 20/07/1953 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 |
C | 1590 | 31590 | 07/1908 | TON W |
Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1961 |
11/02/1961 |
C | 1592 | 31592 | 02/1902 | RAM 70A 73J 73F W |
Ramsgate Nine Elms Tonbridge Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 09/11/1961 07/1963 |
07/1963 |
C | 1593 | 31593 | 05/1902 | TON 73D 70C 74A W |
Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Guildford Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1951 11/12/1954 20/04/1955 08/02/1958 |
08/02/1958 |
C | 1681 | 31681 | 06/1900 | BAT 73D W |
Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 14/02/1959 |
14/02/1959 |
C | 1682 | 31682 | 06/1900 | GIL 70A 73C W |
Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1959 09/02/1960 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
C | 1683 | 31683 | 06/1900 | BAT 73D W 70A |
Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn Nine Elms |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 13/06/1959 14/06/1959 |
13/06/1959 |
C | 1684 | 31684 | 06/1900 | GIL 74D 73D 70A 73J W |
Gillingham (Kent) Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Nine Elms Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1950 05/09/1951 14/06/1959 22/10/1959 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
C | 1686 | 31686 | 07/1900 | TON 73D 73C 73F W |
Tonbridge Gillingham (Kent) Hither Green Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1951 30/06/1952 09/11/1961 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
C | 1687 | 31687 | 07/1900 | BA 73D 73C W |
Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/06/1951 02/04/1955 |
02/04/1955 |
C | 1688 | 31688 | 07/1900 | GIL 73C W |
Gillingham (Kent) Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1951 20/02/1960 |
20/02/1960 |
C | 1689 | 31689 | 07/1900 | HIT 73B W |
Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/11/1961 31/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
C | 1690 | 31690 | 07/1900 | BAT RAM 73C 73F W |
Stewarts Lane Ramsgate Hither Green Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 30/06/1952 09/11/1961 23/06/1962 |
23/06/1962 |
C | 1691 | 31691 | 07/1900 | FAV 73C W |
Faversham Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
C | 1692 | 31692 | 07/1900 | FAV 73C W |
Faversham Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 23/04/1960 |
23/04/1960 |
C | 1693 | 31693 | 07/1900 | BA GIL GIL 73E 73C 73B W |
Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Gillingham (Kent) Faversham Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/05/1949 28/05/1949 12/05/1951 27/07/1951 08/07/1960 10/06/1961 |
10/06/1961 |
C | 1694 | 31694 | 07/1900 | BAT HIT 73B W |
Stewarts Lane Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1948 08/07/1960 25/03/1961 |
25/03/1961 |
C | 1695 | 31695 | 07/1900 | HIT W |
Hither Green Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1961 |
24/06/1961 |
C | 1711 | 31711 | 12/1900 | AFD 73D W |
Ashford Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1954 05/01/1957 |
05/01/1957 |
C | 1712 | 31712 | 12/1900 | BAT GIL 73A 73D W |
Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 12/05/1951 27/07/1951 09/02/1957 |
09/02/1957 |
C | 1713 | 31713 | 12/1900 | GIL 73A 73D W |
Gillingham (Kent) Stewarts Lane Gillingham (Kent) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/07/1951 02/04/1955 |
02/04/1955 |
C | 1714 | 31714 | 12/1900 | BAT 73E 73A W |
Stewarts Lane Faversham Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 14/06/1959 07/1961 |
07/1961 |
C | 1715 | 31715 | 12/1900 | FAV 73A 73E 73A W |
Faversham Stewarts Lane Faversham Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 27/07/1951 14/06/1959 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 |
C | 1716 | 31716 | 01/1901 | BAT 74D W |
Stewarts Lane Tonbridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
C | 1717 | 31717 | 01/1901 | BAT 74D 75C 73B W |
Stewarts Lane Tonbridge Norwood Junction Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/07/1951 17/12/1956 25/01/1957 24/02/1962 |
24/02/1962 |
C | 1718 | 31718 | 01/1901 | BAT W |
Stewarts Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1955 |
24/09/1955 |
C | 1719 | 31719 | 01/1901 | BAT 75C 73A 73B W |
Stewarts Lane Norwood Junction Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1956 25/01/1957 26/05/1961 19/05/1962 |
19/05/1962 |
C | 1720 | 31720 | 01/1901 | HIT 73B 73E 73E 70A 73H 73F W |
Hither Green Bricklayers Arms Faversham Faversham Nine Elms Dover Marine Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 08/02/1954 17/12/1956 14/06/1959 22/10/1959 26/05/1961 21/10/1961 |
21/10/1961 |
C | 1721 | 31721 | 01/1901 | AFD 74A 74E 73C 73F W |
Ashford Ashford St Leonards Hither Green Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1952 11/12/1952 17/12/1956 26/05/1961 31/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
C | 1722 | 31722 | 01/1901 | BAT 73B 70C 75A 73F W |
Stewarts Lane Bricklayers Arms Guildford Brighton Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 17/12/1956 01/02/1962 01/05/1962 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
C | 1723 | 31723 | 01/1901 | BA 70C W |
Bricklayers Arms Guildford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1956 27/01/1962 |
27/01/1962 |
C | 1724 | 31724 | 01/1901 | BA 73D 73B 75E 75A 73C 75A 73C 75A 73C 73A 75A 73F W |
Bricklayers Arms Gillingham (Kent) Bricklayers Arms Three Bridges Brighton Hither Green Brighton Hither Green Brighton Hither Green Stewarts Lane Brighton Ashford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 12/05/1951 11/12/1954 11/03/1955 15/06/1956 17/11/1956 12/06/1957 08/10/1957 06/06/1958 01/05/1959 26/11/1959 08/12/1961 05/05/1962 |
05/05/1962 |
C | 1725 | 31725 | 01/1901 | BA 75D 75A 73C 75A 73C 75A 73C 73C 75A W |
Bricklayers Arms Horsham Brighton Hither Green Brighton Hither Green Brighton Hither Green Hither Green Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1954 11/03/1955 15/06/1956 17/11/1956 12/06/1957 08/10/1957 06/06/1958 01/05/1959 26/11/1959 27/08/1960 |
27/08/1960 |