Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1440 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32090 Week
» 130735 Month
» 333399 Year
» 3360252 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1225 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
British Railways |
31225 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/06/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/05/1948 |
General |
Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. |
SLS/194806 |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1225 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31225 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/06/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31225 |
|
|