Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 4269 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19881 Week
» 118526 Month
» 321190 Year
» 3348043 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1725 |
m/e |
01/1901 |
British Railways |
31725 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 01/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/08/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1725 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31725 |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
11/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
01/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31725 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|