29 Bo-Bo
Pre-TOPS | TOPS | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|
D6100 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 08/12/1967 | ||
D6101 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 24/12/1965 | ||
D6102 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 11/06/1966 | ||
D6103 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 15/10/1965 | ||
D6106 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 22/10/1965 | ||
D6107 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 05/06/1967 | ||
D6108 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 20/10/1967 | ||
D6112 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 10/09/1966 | ||
D6113 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 23/12/1966 | ||
D6114 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 25/02/1966 | ||
D6116 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 14/07/1966 | ||
D6119 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 28/12/1967 | ||
D6121 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 26/02/1966 | ||
D6123 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 05/1963 | ||
D6124 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 08/12/1967 | ||
D6129 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 31/10/1967 | ||
D6130 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 09/04/1966 | ||
D6132 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 02/12/1966 | ||
D6133 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 15/05/1966 | ||
D6137 | Rebuilt from 21 to 29 | 07/11/1967 |