Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6133 |
24/11/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/11/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/11/1962 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
15/05/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/05/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6133 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27863 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
15/05/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6133 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
07/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|