Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4352 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13926 Week
» 78880 Month
» 281544 Year
» 3308397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6106 |
24/03/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/03/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/10/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6106 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27687 Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
22/10/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
18/07/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6106 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
07/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|