Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2512 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33162 Week
» 131807 Month
» 334471 Year
» 3361324 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2435
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5002 |
LUDLOW CASTLE |
13/06/1929 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
17/03/1932 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
28/10/1932 |
Castle |
4037 |
QUEEN PHILIPPA |
03/05/1934 |
Castle |
4084 |
ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE |
09/03/1937 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
03/03/1938 |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
28/06/1938 |
Castle |
5069 |
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL |
08/01/1940 |
Castle |
4016 |
THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) |
04/04/1942 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
14/11/1943 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
06/04/1944 |
Castle |
111 |
VISCOUNT CHURCHILL |
15/09/1944 |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
03/05/1946 |
Castle |
5078 |
BEAUFORT |
22/12/1947 |
Castle |
5051 |
EARL BATHURST |
19/10/1949 |
Castle |
5054 |
EARL OF DUCIE |
20/12/1951 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
12/12/1957 |
Castle |
7035 |
OGMORE CASTLE |
29/01/1960 |
|