|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 02/12/1937 | 28/01/1938 | 58 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2678 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
112859 | |
Swindon Works | 16/11/1939 | 02/01/1940 | 48 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
219249 | |
Swindon Works | 19/09/1941 | 23/11/1941 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
325741 | |
Swindon Works | 07/07/1943 | 27/08/1943 | 52 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2781 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
409449 | |
Swindon Works | 19/05/1944 | 19/06/1944 | 32 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2727 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 02/05/1945 | 08/06/1945 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2816 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
493316 | |
Swindon Works | 16/04/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
595351 | |
Swindon Works | 30/06/1948 | 11/08/1948 | 43 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/11/1949 | 06/12/1949 | 30 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6628 (Diagram HB) |
704843 | |
Swindon Works | 28/09/1951 | 30/10/1951 | 33 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
796262 | |
Swindon Works | 10/09/1953 | 23/10/1953 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2898 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
882941 | |
Swindon Works | 30/08/1955 | 06/10/1955 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
972933 | |
Swindon Works | 07/09/1957 | 30/10/1957 | 54 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1072267 | |
Swindon Works | 27/07/1959 | 18/09/1959 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6657 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1160604 | |
Swindon Works | 26/04/1961 | 23/06/1961 | 59 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1240778 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/11/1946 | Exeter MPD | On 16/11, the following were observed on Exeter shed: 3018, 3395, 3451, 4954, 5051, 5321, 6421, 6957 and 6963; whilst L.M.S. 8.F 8409 and 8421 were on passing freight trains. 1449 and 1468 were working the Heathfield branch and 3335 and 6385 were station pilots. The 11.25 a.m. (G.W.) stopping train to Plymouth was worked by S.R. 21C118 | SLS/194701 |
30/06/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. | SLS/194808 |
28/05/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. | SLS/196107 |
10/04/1965 | Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) | In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. | SLS/196505 |
05/09/1965 | Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) | In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. | SLS/196510 |
06/02/1966 | Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry | 5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. | SLS/196603 |
16/10/1967 | Barry Works | Dumped locomotives - behind the works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5637, 5643, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 42765, 48431, 45690, 53809, 71000, 75014, 92134. Total :58. | SLS/196712 |
07/07/1968 | Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks | Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. | SLS/196810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5051, name: DRYSLLWYN CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Landore (LDR) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
18/08/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL BATHURST' | ||
02/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/12/1937. Dep: 28/01/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2678 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1939. Dep: 02/01/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1941. Dep: 23/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/08/1942 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2543 | ||
07/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1943. Dep: 27/08/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2781 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1944. Dep: 19/06/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2727 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1945. Dep: 08/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2816 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) | ||
30/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1948. Dep: 11/08/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/10/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2435 | ||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 06/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6628 (Diagram HB) |
||
28/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/09/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/09/1953. Dep: 23/10/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2898 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/08/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2601 | ||
30/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 06/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/12/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2912 | ||
07/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/09/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6657 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/04/1961. Dep: 23/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
09/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
24/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5051 from Llanelli (87F) |