|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 06/07/1938 | 08/07/1938 | 3 days | Running Repairs | |||
Swindon Works | 23/03/1939 | 04/04/1939 | 13 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 30/11/1939 | 17/01/1940 | 49 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/03/1942 | 26/04/1942 | 46 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2661 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 01/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 40 days | General | |||
Swindon Works | 09/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 38 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2581 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 21/08/1947 | 30/09/1947 | 41 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2440 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 08/01/1948 | 23/01/1948 | 16 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2801 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/10/1948 | 15/11/1948 | 32 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/04/1949 | 13/05/1949 | 37 days | Heavy General | Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 26/07/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 24 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2702 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 17/01/1951 | 20/02/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Swindon Works | 15/11/1951 | 19/12/1951 | 35 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 17/09/1952 | 22/10/1952 | 36 days | Heavy General | Tender number 2446 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/05/1954 | 23/06/1954 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4096 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 21/07/1955 | 24/08/1955 | 35 days | Heavy General | Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/12/1956 | 27/03/1957 | 100 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/09/1958 | 28/11/1958 | 65 days | Heavy General | Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 01/12/1960 | 03/02/1961 | 65 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2732 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). | SLS/194710 |
31/01/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds | SLS/194803 |
31/10/1948 | Swindon Works | New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered. Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn. |
SLS/194812 |
30/04/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902. |
SLS/194906 |
31/05/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. | SLS/194907 |
31/07/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work July: Nos. 1501 (1/7), 1502 (27/7). Both are unlined black. Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos. 1005/12/25, 1467/68, 2206, 2856/86, 2920, 3663, 3779, 3853, 4013/41/56/61, 4133, 4381, 4631, 4901/43, 5050/69, 5238, 5369, 5552/59, 5918, 6003, 6103/08/22, 6320 (for re-conversion), 6336/45/54, 6417, 6804/38, 6910, 7307, 7809, 7905, 8762. Condemned: 2708 an 9087. No. 3837 (ex 4854) has been re-converted to coal-burning. No. 6020 has been painted blue, while No. 4961 has been Painted black and fully lined. The first of the contractor built series of 94XX arrived on Works on 27/7 viz: Nos. 8400 an 8401; they have entered shops to have the A.T.C. gear fitted. Works' Nos. checked are: Bagnall 2910/11 of 1949. Awaiting Works at the east end of the yard- were Nos. 1000, 2708, 2875, 3635, 4981, 5057, 5554/57, 6844; No. 2863 (ex 4805-oil-burning) was also in evidence. B shop contained Nos. 1363, 1467/68, 2206/11, 2572, 3663/77, 4631, 6408/09/17, 7735, 9638. New engines from Bagnall's were Nos. 8400/1 (makers Nos. 2910/1) and Swindon construction included Nos. 7026 (painted), 7027, 1504 (painted), 1505 and the frames of a diesel (Lot 363). Barry 0-6-2T's Nos. 212, 213 an 246 were acting as Works' shunters. |
SLS/194909 |
04/03/1962 | Swindon Works (Dump) | Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/1938 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5069, name: ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g |
||
06/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 06/07/1938. Dep: 08/07/1938. | ||
23/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1939. Dep: 04/04/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/11/1939. Dep: 17/01/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/03/1942. Dep: 26/04/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2661 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. | ||
09/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 09/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2581 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
21/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/08/1947. Dep: 30/09/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2440 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
08/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1948. Dep: 23/01/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 2801 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1948. Dep: 15/11/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/04/1949. Dep: 13/05/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 2702 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1951. Dep: 20/02/1951. | ||
15/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 19/12/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 22/10/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2446 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
06/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1954. Dep: 23/06/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 4096 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
21/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/07/1955. Dep: 24/08/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/12/1956. Dep: 27/03/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/03/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2808 | ||
25/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/09/1958. Dep: 28/11/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/10/1959 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2593 | ||
01/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/12/1960. Dep: 03/02/1961. Work undertaken: Tender number 2732 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5069 from Laira (83D) | ||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |