Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2467 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33117 Week
» 131762 Month
» 334426 Year
» 3361279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #28126
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
61080 |
|
01/02/1951 |
B1 |
61174 |
|
21/03/1953 |
B1 |
61023 |
HIROLA |
30/04/1955 |
B1 |
61025 |
PALLAH |
07/09/1957 |
B1 |
61161 |
|
08/06/1960 |
B1 |
61013 |
TOPI |
27/04/1962 |
|