|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/04/1947 | 14/04/1947 | 5 days | Special | Tender change |
||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61080 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1949 | 28/12/1949 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1951 | 01/02/1951 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1955 | 20/04/1955 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28267 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1955 | 26/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1955 | 06/05/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1955 | 17/05/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28586 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1957 | 28/11/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1958 | 26/09/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1958 | 06/11/1958 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1959 | 15/06/1959 | 42 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1959 | 02/10/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1960 | 08/02/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1961 | 04/05/1961 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1962 | 24/05/1962 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28353 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1962 | 05/06/1962 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1962 | 22/01/1963 | 54 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/07/1957 | Darlington Works | On the 10th July, D49/2 62727, B16/2 61435 and J26 65755 were noted repainted with the new emblem. There were no engines in the scrap yard waiting cutting up and all that could be seen were the wheels of A5 tank 69833. On Wednesday, 21st August, B1 61131 re-painted ex works was observed at Hett Mill working north on a goods about noon. In the afternoon, B1 61080 also repainted ex works was observed at Cowton working a south bound goods. On the same day, V1 67674, V2 60938 and O7 90469 were noted outside Darlington Works having been overhauled and repainted. In the sidings across Whessoe Road from the works, V2 60914, D49/1 62713, J77 68426 and D20 62387 were observed standing dead. In the scrap yard, T1 69916 was in course of being cut up, only the frames and wheels remaining. Diesel trains are working some services between Darlington and Richmond. With the commencement of the Winter timetable, further diesel trains are expected to be allocated to the Newcastle-Middlesbrough services. | SLS/195709 |
03/05/1964 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1080 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25836 Allocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
10/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 10/04/1947. Dep: 14/04/1947. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
12/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61080 |
||
29/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1949. Dep: 28/12/1949. | ||
10/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 01/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1955. Dep: 20/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28267 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955. | ||
02/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955. | ||
11/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1955. Dep: 17/05/1955. | ||
25/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28586 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1957. Dep: 28/11/1957. | ||
15/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
22/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958. | ||
24/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1958. Dep: 06/11/1958. | ||
05/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1959. Dep: 15/06/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
18/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1959. Dep: 02/10/1959. | ||
04/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1960. Dep: 08/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/04/1961. Dep: 04/05/1961. | ||
24/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1962. Dep: 24/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28353 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1962. Dep: 05/06/1962. | ||
30/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1962. Dep: 22/01/1963. | ||
30/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61080 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Butlers: Otley |