|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/01/1949 | 12/02/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3868 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61161 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1950 | 28/10/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1950 | 08/11/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1952 | 30/05/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28439 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1952 | 12/06/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28222 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1954 | 07/08/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1958 | 11/04/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28204 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1960 | 08/06/1960 | 36 days | General | Complete AWS fltted Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1961 | 03/08/1961 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1962 | 03/02/1962 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1962 | 20/02/1962 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1161 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5519 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3868 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61161 |
||
19/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1950. Dep: 08/11/1950. | ||
05/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28439 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1952. Dep: 12/06/1952. | ||
30/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28222 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954. | ||
29/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. | ||
12/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. | ||
07/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1958. Dep: 11/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28204 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
25/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
04/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1960. Dep: 08/06/1960. Work undertaken: Complete AWS fltted Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
01/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1961. Dep: 03/08/1961. | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
04/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1962. Dep: 03/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1962. Dep: 20/02/1962. | ||
06/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61161 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |