Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2680 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33330 Week
» 131975 Month
» 334639 Year
» 3361492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29465
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60975 |
|
23/12/1950 |
V2 |
60835 |
THE GREEN HOWARD |
06/02/1954 |
V2 |
60979 |
|
04/04/1956 |
V2 |
60900 |
|
22/08/1958 |
V2 |
60902 |
|
13/10/1961 |
|