|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1942 | 04/11/1942 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1946 | 02/02/1946 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1947 | 02/01/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9171 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1949 | 04/11/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60900 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1951 | 04/04/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1952 | 10/03/1952 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1952 | 30/12/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1954 | 17/09/1954 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1956 | 08/05/1956 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1956 | 24/10/1956 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1958 | 22/08/1958 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1960 | 11/08/1960 | 35 days | Light Casual | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1961 | 17/06/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1962 | 30/10/1962 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/10/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. | SLS/194912 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/03/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4871 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1831 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
01/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1942. Dep: 04/11/1942. | ||
22/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 800 but not taken up | ||
02/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946. | ||
23/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 900 | ||
03/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1947. Dep: 02/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9171 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1949. Dep: 04/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60900 |
||
05/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/03/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951. | ||
19/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1952. Dep: 10/03/1952. | ||
28/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 30/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
28/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1956. Dep: 08/05/1956. | ||
18/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1956. Dep: 24/10/1956. | ||
26/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1958. Dep: 22/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1960. Dep: 11/08/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1961. Dep: 17/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
08/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1962. Dep: 30/10/1962. | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs | ||
11/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60900 from St Margarets (64A) |