|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1941 | 07/02/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1947 | 03/04/1947 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1948 | 15/12/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8932 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60902 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1952 | 25/03/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1952 | 27/01/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1954 | 15/12/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1956 | 04/01/1957 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1958 | 04/11/1958 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1959 | 12/06/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1961 | 13/10/1961 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) Double blastpipe fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/03/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4873 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1833 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
27/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 07/02/1942. | ||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. | ||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 802 but not taken up | ||
18/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
09/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 902 | ||
16/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1947. Dep: 03/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1948. Dep: 15/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8932 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60902 |
||
24/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 25/03/1952. | ||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 27/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
12/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
16/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1954. Dep: 15/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29421 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
14/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1956. Dep: 04/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1958. Dep: 04/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
11/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1959. Dep: 12/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
11/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1961. Dep: 13/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) Double blastpipe fitted |
||
27/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60902 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
07/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |