Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3187 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33837 Week
» 132482 Month
» 335146 Year
» 3361999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6661
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5074 |
DENBIGH CASTLE |
26/07/1938 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
19/01/1945 |
Castle |
5091 |
CLEEVE ABBEY |
05/11/1948 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
02/06/1950 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
16/05/1952 |
Castle |
5089 |
WESTMINSTER ABBEY |
09/03/1954 |
Castle |
5068 |
BEVERSTON CASTLE |
17/02/1956 |
Castle |
5051 |
EARL BATHURST |
22/06/1961 |
|