Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1771 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27805 Week
» 126450 Month
» 329114 Year
» 3355967 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2216
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2725 |
|
22/04/1929 |
J39 |
2710 |
|
29/08/1931 |
J39 |
2709 |
|
05/05/1934 |
J39 |
2702 |
|
13/03/1936 |
J39 |
1496 |
|
29/01/1938 |
J39 |
2777 |
|
18/01/1941 |
J39 |
4831 |
|
21/12/1946 |
|