|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/07/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1936 | 10/10/1936 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1939 | 26/08/1939 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1939 | 12/09/1939 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1943 | 01/04/1944 | 118 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 101 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4763 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1949 | 19/02/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64763 |
||
Derby Works | 04/03/1952 | 04/04/1952 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 15/08/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27807 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1956 | 07/04/1956 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1956 | 28/07/1956 | 52 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27684 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/09/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2710 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1424 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
14/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
23/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
17/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1939. Dep: 12/09/1939. | ||
14/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
06/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1943. Dep: 01/04/1944. | ||
12/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4763 |
||
07/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64763 |
||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
04/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 04/04/1952. | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
15/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27807 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
24/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 07/04/1956. | ||
07/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956. | ||
22/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27684 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64763 from Colwick (40E) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |