|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/02/1931 | 28/03/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1936 | 13/03/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1939 | 13/01/1940 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1942 | 21/11/1942 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 176 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1948 | 10/05/1948 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 4936 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64755 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1949 | 18/06/1949 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 4918 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 05/05/1951 | 23/08/1951 | 111 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27756 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1953 | 21/05/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1955 | 11/02/1956 | 58 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27704 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1951 | Derby Works | During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. | SLS/195109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2702 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1416 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
19/01/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
24/01/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931. | ||
21/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1936. Dep: 13/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. | ||
01/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4755 | ||
29/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1948. Dep: 10/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4936 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64755 |
||
17/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949. | ||
23/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4918 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951. | ||
30/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27756 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1953. Dep: 21/05/1953. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
16/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1955. Dep: 11/02/1956. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27704 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
10/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64755 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |