Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4215 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34865 Week
» 133510 Month
» 336174 Year
» 3363027 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7607 |
24/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25257 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
24/03/1966 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
02/12/1985 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/03/1966 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7607 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25257 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
02/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25257 |
|
|
01/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|