Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3770 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34420 Week
» 133065 Month
» 335729 Year
» 3362582 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7602 |
21/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25252 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/02/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/02/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7602 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25252 |
|
|
30/03/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25252 |
|
|
09/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|