Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 1331 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31981 Week
» 130626 Month
» 333290 Year
» 3360143 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5250 |
14/02/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25100 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
14/02/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/1981 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
on 14/12/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/02/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/05/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/02/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/05/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5250 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) (On Loan) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25100 |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25100 |
|
|
14/12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|