Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1154 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31804 Week
» 130449 Month
» 333113 Year
» 3359966 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5215 |
15/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25065 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5215 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
31/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25065 |
|
|
01/05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25065 |
|
|
02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|