Scrapyard: Hesslewoods Attercliffe
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63607 | 01/1912 | 05/09/1965 | 53.677 | 40E | Colwick | |||
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63604 | 06/1913 | 01/05/1964 | 50.912 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63726 | 10/1919 | 23/04/1964 | 44.553 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61075 | 16/09/1946 | 22/09/1963 | 17.027 | 0.230 | 41F | Mexborough | 12/1963 | 17.258 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61213 | 10/07/1947 | 19/04/1964 | 16.789 | 0.156 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 06/1964 | 16.945 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90214 | 01/1943 | 07/03/1964 | 21.156 | 0.775 | 12/1964 | 21.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90402 | 02/1944 | 28/03/1964 | 20.129 | 0.718 | 12/1964 | 20.847 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61224 | 15/08/1947 | 31/07/1966 | 18.973 | 0.126 | 56A | Wakefield | 09/1966 | 19.099 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61050 | 17/06/1946 | 10/02/1966 | 19.666 | 2.679 | 41J | Shirebrook | 10/1968 | 22.345 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 32 | 30/04/1948 | 10/02/1966 | 17.795 | 2.644 | 41J | Shirebrook | 02/10/1968 | 20.438 |
Diesel | BR | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2864 | 25/10/1961 | 28/02/1970 | 8.351 | 1.126 | 04/1971 | 9.477 | ||
Diesel | BR | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2850 | 06/10/1960 | 20/06/1970 | 9.710 | 0.986 | 06/1971 | 10.696 | ||
Diesel | BR | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2855 | 21/11/1960 | 04/10/1970 | 9.874 | 0.696 | 06/1971 | 10.570 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03106 | 15/10/1960 | 17/09/1975 | 14.932 | 0.660 | 05/1976 | 15.592 |