Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 486 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6270 Week
» 27659 Month
» 147186 Year
» 3174039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | RET | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 36E | 01/02/1950 | 14/06/1965 |
|
Date Opened |
16/07/1849 |
Date Closed |
01/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MSLR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the Retford-Gainsborough line. The yard is visible from the line.
Go straight ahead outside the Station into Victoria Road, and
bear right into Albert Road, Turn right into London Road (A1), and
cross the railway bridge. Turn first right past the bridge, and the shed
entrance is on the right. Walking time 15 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 16/07/1849 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to RET | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 36E | 01/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|