Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1935 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4100 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 15/08/1935 | 26/10/1965 | ||
4101 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 22/08/1935 | 13/06/1964 | ||
4102 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 29/08/1935 | 21/09/1962 | ||
4103 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 29/08/1935 | 07/09/1964 | ||
4104 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 31/08/1935 | 14/05/1964 | ||
4105 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/09/1935 | 01/02/1964 | ||
4106 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/09/1935 | 13/09/1962 | ||
4107 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 16/09/1935 | 25/06/1965 | ||
4108 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 17/09/1935 | 09/10/1964 | ||
4109 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 19/09/1935 | 20/04/1964 | ||
4110 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/10/1936 | 03/06/1965 | ||
4111 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/10/1936 | 18/09/1965 | ||
4112 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 15/10/1936 | 10/08/1962 | ||
4113 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 20/10/1936 | 18/11/1965 | ||
4114 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 28/10/1936 | 20/11/1963 | ||
4115 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 31/10/1936 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4116 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/11/1936 | 21/09/1962 | ||
4117 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/11/1936 | 25/09/1961 | ||
4118 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 13/11/1936 | 05/09/1962 | ||
4119 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 20/11/1936 | 13/09/1963 |