Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 921 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18724 Week
» 71740 Month
» 191267 Year
» 3218120 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4108 |
on |
17/09/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
292 |
To Service |
Fri 17/09/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/10/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4108 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (BAN) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stafford Road (SRD) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Truro (83F) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4108 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|