Manufacturer: Derby Works
Builder | Derby Works |
Order Date | 1924 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | Compound |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1045 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 02/1924 | 08/06/1957 | ||
1046 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 02/1924 | 24/01/1953 | ||
1047 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 02/1924 | 10/02/1954 | ||
1048 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 03/1924 | 19/10/1957 | ||
1049 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 03/1924 | 03/1959 | ||
1050 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 03/1924 | 02/06/1956 | ||
1051 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 03/1924 | 06/11/1954 | ||
1052 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1924 | 04/1953 | ||
1053 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1924 | 26/05/1956 | ||
1054 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1924 | 18/09/1954 | ||
1055 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1924 | 02/1953 | ||
1056 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1924 | 24/10/1953 | ||
1057 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1924 | 02/05/1953 | ||
1058 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1924 | 10/02/1954 | ||
1059 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1924 | 12/11/1955 | ||
1060 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1924 | 01/03/1958 | ||
1061 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1924 | 28/05/1955 | ||
1062 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1924 | 02/05/1959 | ||
1063 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1924 | 04/10/1960 | ||
1064 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1924 | 19/01/1957 | ||
1065 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1924 | 10/03/1956 | ||
1066 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 08/1924 | 10/05/1958 | ||
1067 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 08/1924 | 05/02/1955 | ||
1068 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 08/1924 | 12/1958 | ||
1069 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 09/1924 | 19/11/1955 | ||
1070 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 09/1924 | 19/11/1955 | ||
1071 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 09/1924 | 10/03/1958 | ||
1072 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 09/1924 | 29/10/1955 | ||
1073 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 10/1924 | 17/08/1957 | ||
1074 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 10/1924 | 07/08/1954 |