Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4585 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30619 Week
» 129264 Month
» 331928 Year
» 3358781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1050 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
British Railways |
41050 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 03/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/06/1956 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1924 |
14B |
|
Kentish Town |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
17A |
|
Derby |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
02/06/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
15D |
Bedford |
4w/e |
04/09/1954 |
EXLOAN |
14B |
Kentish Town |
4w/e |
04/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
LOAN |
15D |
Bedford |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
EXLOAN |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/06/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1050 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41050 |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/06/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41050 |
|
|