Manufacturer: Crewe Works
Builder | Crewe Works |
Order Date | 1935 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Information | Replaced Lot 105 for 10 Improved Prince of Wales 4-6-0's and 10 light 4-6-0's for Scotland |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5000 | 216 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 28/10/1967 | |
5001 | 217 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 16/03/1968 | |
5002 | 218 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 03/07/1965 | |
5003 | 219 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 06/1967 | |
5004 | 220 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 09/1966 | |
5005 | 221 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 27/01/1968 | |
5006 | 222 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 16/09/1967 | |
5007 | 223 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 23/07/1964 | |
5008 | 224 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 05/1964 | |
5009 | 225 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 22/11/1965 | |
5010 | 226 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 29/08/1963 | |
5011 | 227 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 28/12/1965 | |
5012 | 228 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 08/10/1966 | |
5013 | 229 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 05/1968 | |
5014 | 230 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 24/06/1967 | |
5015 | 231 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 16/09/1967 | |
5016 | 232 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 14/07/1966 | |
5017 | 233 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 10/08/1968 | |
5018 | 234 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 24/12/1966 | |
5019 | 235 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 13/05/1967 |