|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | St Rollox Works | The following locomotives have been painted in the temporary B.R. livery, i.e. unlined black with plain white lettering (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date):-Nos. 615 (4458) 9/2; 642 (4340) 18/2; 666 (4339) 1/3; 914 (4014) 17/2; 938 (4457) 26/2; 1138 (3555) 24/2; 2736 (4170) 29/2; 2749 (3336) 26/2; 2914 (4272) 20/2; 4323 (3817) 20/2; 5012 (9064) 9/2; 5018 (9829) 20/2; 5081 (9069) 2/2; 5082 (9005) 4/2; 5117 (9179) 24/2; 5127 (9713) 10/2; 5359 (9599) 19/2; 5459 (9593) 27/2; 5575 (9023) 10/2; 8185 (9912) 5/2; 8303 (10030) 12/2; 14476 (6173) 16/2; 14487 (6179) 25/2; 14501 (6209) 11/2; 17269 (910) 16/2; 17600 (1681) 11/2 and 17666 (1747) 12/2. No. 17313 arrived in the shops ex the dump on 20/2 and was cut up on 23/2. The boiler (Class N34 No. 1161) is to be repaired and used again | SLS/194804 |
27/08/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. | SLS/194910 |
01/05/1965 | Cowlairs Works (Outside) | Erecting shop: 42138/693, 44727/92, 44845/949/91/7, 45034/54/115/82/390, 76050, 73053/100, 80122, 90199; Outside: 45012/28, 45403/51, 73151, 76024. | SLS/196506 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5012 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 228 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A) | ||
17/09/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45012 | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Inverness (60A) | ||
01/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Inverness (60A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) | ||
15/06/1957 | Report | Report: An unusual sight at South Elmsall on June 15 was Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 45012 (68A) at the head of an unidentitied Leeds-Doncaster train. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
10/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
23/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) | ||
08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45012 | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |