Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1054 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31704 Week
» 130349 Month
» 333013 Year
» 3359866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5801 |
08/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31271 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
302 |
To Service |
08/06/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1997 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
08/06/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1980 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5801 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 302 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
03/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31271 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
01/05/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31271 |
|
|