Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1405 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12620 Week
» 3676 Month
» 350100 Year
» 3376953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4090 |
14/03/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
10 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
14/03/1962 to Gorton (9G) |
Withdrawn |
11/08/1968 |
Time in Service |
6 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/1969 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
14/03/1962 |
Power Unit 61C282 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4090 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
23/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4090 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|