Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 371 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3962 Week
» 14097 Month
» 330328 Year
» 841430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Gorton


Depot Details
Depot Name Gorton
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
GOR187531/01/1950
39A01/02/195031/01/1958
9H01/02/195831/03/1958
9G01/04/195831/05/1965
Date Closed 14/06/1965
Big 4 Company LNER
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line between Ashburys and Gorton Stations. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside Ashburys Station into Pottery Lane, and right into Ashton Old Road. Turn right into Wellington Street, and the shed entrance is a door on the right hand side.
Walking time 15 minutes.
See also under Manchester.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to GOR
01/02/1950Change of code to 39A
01/02/1958Change of code to 9H
01/04/1958Change of code to 9G
14/06/1965Depot closed