Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3003 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 14218 Week
» 5274 Month
» 351698 Year
» 3378551 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4033 |
09/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08865 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
09/09/1960 |
Power Unit IH4583 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4033 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08865 |
|
|
20/11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|