Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 153 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 11368 Week
» 2424 Month
» 348848 Year
» 3375701 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13304 |
02/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3304 |
03/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08234 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/05/1956 |
Power Unit IH3494 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13304 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3304 |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08234 |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08234 from Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
01/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|