Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 623 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31273 Week
» 129918 Month
» 332582 Year
» 3359435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1689 |
21/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47486 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/11/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/07/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
03/1978 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
15/07/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
03/1978 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1689 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 451 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
15/07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47486 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47486 |
|
|
06/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|