Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3440 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30619 Week
» 21675 Month
» 368099 Year
» 3394952 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7639 |
23/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25289 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/12/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 02/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7639 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
08/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25289 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
17/01/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25289 |
|
|
20/10/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|