Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3483 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30662 Week
» 21718 Month
» 368142 Year
» 3394995 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7635 |
05/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25285 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/11/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7635 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
17/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25285 |
|
|
17/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25285 |
|
|
10/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|