Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2065 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29244 Week
» 20300 Month
» 366724 Year
» 3393577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7634 |
19/10/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25284 |
20/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/10/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1973 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
10/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/10/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
10/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7634 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
20/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
20/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
20/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25284 |
|
|
21/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25284 |
|
|
10/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|