Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1724 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 22758 Week
» 121403 Month
» 324067 Year
» 3350920 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5234 |
11/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25084 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/12/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/09/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/09/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5234 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25084 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
18/12/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25084 |
|
|
07/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|