Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2281 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32931 Week
» 131576 Month
» 334240 Year
» 3361093 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4178 |
31/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08948 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/04/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
30/04/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4178 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
30/04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08948 |
|
|