Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 653 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31303 Week
» 129948 Month
» 332612 Year
» 3359465 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3864 |
19/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08697 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
19/12/1959 to Derby (17A) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3864 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
06/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08697 |
|
|