Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2784 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28818 Week
» 127463 Month
» 330127 Year
» 3356980 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2299 |
11/10/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2299 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd., Works Number 2680 Allocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
23/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/01/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2299 |
|
|
02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|