Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 704 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31354 Week
» 129999 Month
» 332663 Year
» 3359516 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2155 |
26/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03155 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2155 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
06/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (DG) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
21/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
26/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
17/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03155 |
|
|
11/06/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03155 |
|
|
04/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|