Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4266 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34916 Week
» 133561 Month
» 336225 Year
» 3363078 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1685 |
08/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47098 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/11/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/06/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
10/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1983 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1685 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 447 Allocated to Oxley (2B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/06/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47098 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
22/06/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47098 |
|
|
11/09/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: at Cardiff Canton MPD |
|
|