Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4332 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30366 Week
» 129011 Month
» 331675 Year
» 3358528 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12066 |
30/12/1949 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12066 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (18A) |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
19/04/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12066 |
|
|
01/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|