Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 731 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31381 Week
» 130026 Month
» 332690 Year
» 3359543 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
LMS |
7127 |
12/09/1947 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12040 |
08/03/1952 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£10,260.00 |
To Service |
12/09/1947 to Saltley (21A) |
Withdrawn |
19/10/1968 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/1970 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1947 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1947 |
To Service |
|
|
|
08/03/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12040 |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12040 |
|
|
01/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|